Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01169
Date Filed2020-05-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department Treasury, Department of State, the Department of Health and Human Services, and the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for records concerning communications pertaining to corona virus. American Oversight also requested expedited processing. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. CMS granted American Oversight's request for expedited processing, while the State Department denied its request for expedited processing. American Oversight filed an administrative appeal of the State Department's denial of its request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantCENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-051COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7091550) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Treasury FOIA), # 2 Exhibit B (State FOIA), # 3 Exhibit C (CMS FOIA), # 4 Exhibit D (HHS FOIA), # 5 Exhibit E (State Appeal), # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons as to USAO, # 8 Summons as to USAG, # 9 Summons as to Treasury, # 10 Summons as to State, # 11 Summons as to HHS, # 12 Summons as to CMS)(Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-052LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-05Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (adh, ) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-053SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-064STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 05/06/20. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 05/06/2020)
2020-05-195RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/18/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/17/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/18/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES served on 5/18/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES served on 5/18/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 5/18/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 5/18/2020 (Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 05/19/2020)
2020-05-216NOTICE of Appearance by James O. Bickford on behalf of CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Bickford, James) (Entered: 05/21/2020)
2020-05-217NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Consolidate by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Motion to Consolidate)(Bickford, James) (Entered: 05/21/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar