Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleACCO ENGINEERED SYSTEMS, INC. v. NAVAL FACILITIES ENGINEERING COMMAND
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01171
Date Filed2020-05-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffACCO ENGINEERED SYSTEMS, INC.
Case DescriptionAcco Engineered Systems submitted a FOIA request to Naval Facilities Engineering Command for Contract Number N62473-13-D-0607 awarded to Fortis Networks. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Acco Engineered Systems filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNAVAL FACILITIES ENGINEERING COMMAND
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-051COMPLAINT against NAVAL FACILITIES ENGINEERING COMMAND ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7092249) filed by ACCO ENGINEERED SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-052LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ACCO ENGINEERED SYSTEMS, INC. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-06Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, ) (Entered: 05/06/2020)
2020-05-063SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NAVAL FACILITIES ENGINEERING COMMAND, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/06/2020)
2020-05-124NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of NAVAL FACILITIES ENGINEERING COMMAND (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 05/12/2020)
2020-05-145RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/8/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/7/2020. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-146RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NAVAL FACILITIES ENGINEERING COMMAND served on 5/11/2020 (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar