Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLaws v. United States of America Department of Science and Technology et al
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2020cv02704
Date Filed2020-05-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Virginia M. Kendall
PlaintiffReginald D Laws
Case DescriptionReginald Laws submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Energy. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Laws filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States of America Department of Science and Technology c/o Mung Chaing
DefendantUnited States of America Department of Energy c/o Rick Perry
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-245ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020. Mailed notice (ph, ) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-051RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Reginald D Laws. (ph, ) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-052CIVIL Cover Sheet. (ph, ) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-053APPLICATION by Plaintiff Reginald D Laws for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (ph, ) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-054PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Reginald D Laws. (ph, ) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-076NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, ) (Entered: 05/07/2020)
2020-05-077ORDER signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 5/7/2020. Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis 3 is granted. But Plaintiff has not established that this case is ripe for judicial review, so the Complaint is dismissed without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. Plaintiff may file a renewed Complaint within 21 days of the entry of this Order in which he must describe whether he filed FOIA requests with the agencies and whether he exhausted his administrative remedies. Otherwise, this case will be summarily dismissed. See Order for further details. Mailed notice(lk, ) (Entered: 05/07/2020)
2020-05-188AMENDED complaint by Reginald D Laws against United States of America Department of Energy, United States of America Department of Science and Technology (pj, ) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar