Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleStevens et al v. United States Immigration Customs Enforcement, et al.,
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2020cv02725
Date Filed2020-05-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Mary M. Rowland
PlaintiffJacqueline Stevens
Case DescriptionJacqueline Stevens, a professor of political science at Northwestern University, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning a list of ICE Enforcement and Removal Field and Subfield offices by control city. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked Stevens to clarify the request. Stevens provided some clarification. The agency provided a final response with a single page spreadsheet. Stevens filed an administrative appeal of that decision. Stevens submitted a second FOIA request for records concerning communications between the agency and Rep. Lauren Underwood (D-IL). The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but provided no further records. Stevens submitted other FOIA requests for records pertaining to identified jails used to house detainees. The agency acknowledged of those requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of her requests, Stevens filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-244ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020 (rc, ) (Entered: 05/06/2020)
2020-05-051COMPLAINT filed by Jacqueline Stevens; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16989749.(Glazer, Nicolette) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-052CIVIL Cover Sheet (Glazer, Nicolette) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-05CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, ) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-063NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, ) (Entered: 05/06/2020)
2020-05-08SUMMONS Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (dxb, ) (Entered: 05/08/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar