Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLaws v. United States of America, et al
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2020cv02705
Date Filed2020-05-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Robert M. Dow, Jr
PlaintiffReginald D. Laws
Case DescriptionReginald Laws submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Laws filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States of America
DefendantDemer Barr Department of Justice Inspector General, Mr.
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-245ORDER: Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020. Mailed notice (smm, ) (Entered: 05/06/2020)
2020-05-051RECEIVED Complaint and No copies by Reginald D. Laws. (smm, ) (Entered: 05/06/2020)
2020-05-052CIVIL Cover Sheet. (smm, ) (Entered: 05/06/2020)
2020-05-053PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Reginald D. Laws. (smm, ) (Entered: 05/06/2020)
2020-05-054APPLICATION by Plaintiff Reginald D. Laws to proceed without prepaying fees or costs/financial affidavit (Non-Prisoner Case). (smm, ) (Entered: 05/06/2020)
2020-05-066EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr for all further proceedings. Honorable Robert W. Gettleman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/6/20. (smm, ) (Entered: 05/08/2020)
2020-05-117NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, ) (Entered: 05/11/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar