Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01180
Date Filed2020-05-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Education and Department of Housing and Urban Development for records concerning the Urban Revitalization Coalition, a non-profit group founded and operated by supporters of President Trump. CREW sent two requests to the Department of Education pertaining to a cancelled event at Virginia Union University scheduled to honor President Trump on Martin Luther King Day. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. CREW also submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Housing and Urban Development for records concerning communications between HUD's Cleveland Office and URC. The agency acknowledged the request. After hearing nothing further from either agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-061COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7096054) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Dep't of Education, # 3 Summons HUD, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney D.C.)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 05/06/2020)
2020-05-06Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (adh, ) (Entered: 05/06/2020)
2020-05-062LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 05/06/2020)
2020-05-063SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/06/2020)
2020-05-064STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 6, 2020. (lcbah3) (Entered: 05/06/2020)
2020-05-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/11/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/10/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 5/11/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT served on 5/11/2020 (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 05/13/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar