Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01196
Date Filed2020-05-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Thomas F. Hogan
PlaintiffAMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL
Case DescriptionThe American Immigration Council submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement's response to the corona virus pandemic. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AIC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantIMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-071COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7102437) filed by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons)(Creighton, Emily) (Entered: 05/07/2020)
2020-05-072LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL (Creighton, Emily) (Entered: 05/07/2020)
2020-05-07Case Assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (adh, ) (Entered: 05/07/2020)
2020-05-073SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/07/2020)
2020-05-114NOTICE of Appearance by Claudia Valenzuela on behalf of AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL (Valenzuela, Claudia) (Entered: 05/11/2020)
2020-05-115NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Creighton on behalf of AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL (Creighton, Emily) (Entered: 05/11/2020)
2020-05-126MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Valenzuela, Claudia) (Entered: 05/12/2020)
2020-05-187NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander V. Sverdlov on behalf of All Defendants (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-188Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-18MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants' response shall be filed by May 26, 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on May 18, 2020. (CR) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response due by 5/26/2020 (hs) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-199RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 5/15/2020; IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 5/18/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/18/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/18/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/17/2020.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Valenzuela, Claudia) (Entered: 05/19/2020)
2020-05-2610Memorandum in opposition to re 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Attachment A, # 2 Declaration Attachment B)(Sverdlov, Alexander) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-05-27MINUTE ORDER. A telephonic hearing on 6 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is scheduled for June 2, 2020 at 2:00 PM before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on May 27, 2020. (CR) (Entered: 05/27/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar