Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleActive Thermal Concepts, Inc. v. US Dept of Veterans Affairs
DistrictNorthern District of Iowa
CityCedar Rapids
Case Number1:2020cv00050
Date Filed2020-05-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Mark A Roberts
PlaintiffActive Thermal Concepts, Inc
Case DescriptionActive Thermal Concepts submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Active Thermal Concepts filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS Dept of Veterans Affairs
DefendantDepartment of Veterans Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-081COMPLAINT against Active Thermal Concepts, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3195834.), filed by Active Thermal Concepts, Inc.. Scheduling Report due by 8/6/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wagner, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2020: # 2 Exhibit A) (jag). (Entered: 05/08/2020)
2020-05-11Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added (no conflicts identified). (pac) (Entered: 05/11/2020)
2020-05-112NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 6/10/2020. (pac) (Entered: 05/11/2020)
2020-05-113Summons Issued as to US Dept of Veterans Affairs. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: # 1 Civil Case Packet) (pac) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/12/2020 to include court seal) (pac). (Entered: 05/11/2020)
2020-05-11Set Deadline: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 5/29/2020. (pac) (Entered: 05/11/2020)
2020-05-114(FILED IN ERROR - NOW ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT AS EXHIBIT A) SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM 1 Complaint by Active Thermal Concepts, Inc. (Wagner, John) Modified text on 5/13/2020 per direction of MAR Chambers (jag). (Entered: 05/11/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar