Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCALLIMACHI v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01238
Date Filed2020-05-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffRUKMINI CALLIMACHI
Case DescriptionRukmini Callimachi, an investigative journalist, submitted six FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning her deceased stepfather, Mihail Horia Botez and his connection to the Romanian communist government. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency told Callimachi that several requests were too broad to be searched and needed clarification. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of her request, Callimachi filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-121COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7116162) filed by RUKMINI CALLIMACHI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E, # 2 Exhibit F-J, # 3 Exhibit K-O, # 4 Exhibit P-T, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/12/2020)
2020-05-122NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of RUKMINI CALLIMACHI (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/12/2020)
2020-05-13Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (adh, ) (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-05-133SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-06-184RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 5/20/2020 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/20/2020. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/20/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/19/2020. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-197ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-06-19MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 8/3/2020. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/19/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-06-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/3/2020. (tb) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-08-038Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 08/03/2020)
2020-08-04MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 8 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint report and proposed order by October 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/4/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 08/04/2020)
2020-08-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Report due by 10/2/2020. (tb) (Entered: 08/04/2020)
2020-10-029Joint STATUS REPORT by RUKMINI CALLIMACHI. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-05MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 9 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint report by 12/1/20 and every 60 days thereafter. To the extent the report contains a proposed production or briefing schedule, the report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/5/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-10-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/1/2020. (tb) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-12-0110Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2021-01-2911Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
2021-01-2912NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney Paul Mussenden (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
2021-03-1813NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Johnny Walker (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-04-0214Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 04/02/2021)
2021-06-0215Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 06/02/2021)
2021-08-0216Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 08/02/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar