Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGANDLUR v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01241
Date Filed2020-05-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffSHREYAS GANDLUR
Case DescriptionShreyas Gandlur submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Prisons for metadata for all emails sent or received by MCC New York Warden Shirley Skipper-Scott between July 1, 2019 and August 12, 2019. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request under Exemption 5 (privileges), Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy), and Exemption 7 (law enforcement records). Gandlur filed an administrative appeal of the denial. The agency acknowledged request of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Gandlur filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-121COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7116801) filed by SHREYAS GANDLUR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons)(Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 05/12/2020)
2020-05-122NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of SHREYAS GANDLUR (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 05/12/2020)
2020-05-123NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of SHREYAS GANDLUR (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/12/2020)
2020-05-13Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-05-134SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/13/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar