Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleUrban Justice Center v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2020cv03691
Date Filed2020-05-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Katherine Polk Failla
PlaintiffUrban Justice Center
Case DescriptionThe Urban Justice Center submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning the agency's alert system for identifying and rejecting U-Visa applications. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Urban Justice Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-121COMPLAINT against U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19806883)Document filed by Urban Justice Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - March 9, 2020 Letter from Kyle Dandelet to USCIS, # 2 Exhibit B - March 27, 2020 Letter from Jill A. Eggleston to Kyle Dandelet).(Kroman, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/12/2020)
2020-05-122CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kroman, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/12/2020)
2020-05-123RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Urban Justice Center..(Kroman, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/12/2020)
2020-05-124REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Urban Justice Center..(Kroman, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/12/2020)
2020-05-125NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL by Kyle A. Dandelet on behalf of Urban Justice Center.(Dandelet, Kyle) (Entered: 05/12/2020)
2020-05-13CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(pne) (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-05-13Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pne) (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-05-13Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-05-136ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services..(pne) (Entered: 05/13/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar