Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCOMMUNIDAD COLECTIVA v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01256
Date Filed2020-05-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffCOMMUNIDAD COLECTIVA
Case DescriptionCommunidad Colectiva submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning alleged surveillance of Communidad Colectiva in North Carolina. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but told Communidad Colectiva that is request was too broad to allow for a search. Communidad Colectiva responded that its request was not too broad and the agency agreed to conduct a search. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Communidad Colectiva filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-131COMPLAINT against IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7120089) filed by COMMUNIDAD COLECTIVA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, # 7 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 8 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia)(Ragland, Thomas) (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-05-132MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sejal Zota, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7120305. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by COMMUNIDAD COLECTIVA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sejal Zota, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ragland, Thomas) (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-05-133MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher N. Lasch, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7120410. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by COMMUNIDAD COLECTIVA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher N. Lasch, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ragland, Thomas) (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-05-13Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb) (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-05-134SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-05-135STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 05/13/20. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-05-14MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying without prejudice 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Local Civil Rule 83.2(d) delineates the materials that must be submitted in support of a motion for leave to appear pro hac vice , including "a certification that the attorney either has or has not been disciplined by any bar, and if the attorney has been disciplined by any bar, the circumstances and details of the discipline[.]" LCvR 83.2(d)(4). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/14/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar