Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01258
Date Filed2020-05-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK
Case DescriptionThe National Student Legal Defense Network submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Education for records concerning communications with non-governmental parties pertaining to the Notice of Proposed Rulemaking title Program Integrity: Gainful Employment. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told NSLDN that the request had been sent to multiple offices for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, NSLDN filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-131COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7121639) filed by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Lewis, Emma) Modified on 5/14/2020 to correct docket text (zsb). (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-05-132LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK (Lewis, Emma) Modified on 5/14/2020 to correct docket text (zsb). (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-05-14Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (adh, ) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-143SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-144STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 05/14/20. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar