Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTAX ANALYSTS v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01268
Date Filed2020-05-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffTAX ANALYSTS
Case DescriptionTax Analysts submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning final decisions of an administrative law judge and the appellate authority in Circular 230 cases from 2015 to the present. Tax Analysts also asked the agency to post such decisions. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The IRS provided 70 pages of records and denied Tax Analysts' request to post the opinions online. Tax Analysts filed an administrative appeal which was denied by the agency. Tax Analysts then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-131COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7121826) filed by TAX ANALYSTS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-05-14Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (adh, ) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-142SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-143STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/14/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-144LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TAX ANALYSTS (Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-285RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/26/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/25/2020. (Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-05-286RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 5/22/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/26/2020. (eg) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-06-247Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-24MINUTE ORDER granting the Defendant's 7 unopposed Motion for Extension. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by July 9, 2020. The Court directs the parties' attention to paragraph 9 of the Court's 3 Standing Order, which states that all motions for extension "must be filed at least four business days prior to the first affected deadline." Future requests that do not comply with this requirement may be denied. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/24/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's answer to Plaintiff's Complaint due by 7/9/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-07-098ANSWER to Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-09MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a Complaint and an Answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before July 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/9/2020. (lctnm1) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/30/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
2020-07-309Joint STATUS REPORT by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
2020-07-30MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before October 28, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/30/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
2020-07-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/28/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
2020-10-2810Joint STATUS REPORT by TAX ANALYSTS. (Hitchcock, Cornish) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-10-28MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another Joint Status Report on or before December 15, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/28/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-10-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/15/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-12-1511Joint STATUS REPORT by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
2020-12-15MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another Joint Status Report on or before February 28, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/15/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
2020-12-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/28/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
2021-02-2612Joint STATUS REPORT by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 02/26/2021)
2021-02-26MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another Joint Status Report on or before April 20, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/26/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 02/26/2021)
2021-03-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/20/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 03/01/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar