Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCODREA v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01275
Date Filed2020-05-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffDAVID CODREA
Case DescriptionDavid Cordrea submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning legal positions taken by the government in Second Amendment cases. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Cordrea filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-141COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7123867) filed by DAVID CODREA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit FOIA on DOJ, # 3 Exhibit Acknowledgment Letter from DOJ, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-14Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-142SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-283RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/26/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/25/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit delivery confirmation)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-05-284RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/18/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/18/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit delivery confirmation)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-06-015ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 06/01/2020. (DM) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-256ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-06-257ORDER for meet and confer and joint status report. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/25/2020. (lcckk3) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-06-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/10/2020. (dot) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-08-108Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-08-11MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report. The parties report that Plaintiff agreed to narrow the scope of his request. The search for responsive records is pending, and Defendant estimates that it will be completed by October 9, 2020. The Court ORDERS the parties to file a further joint status report by OCTOBER 15, 2020 and every 30 days thereafter, updating the Court on Defendant's progress in responding the Plaintiff's FOIA request. If the parties require the Court's attention between deadlines, they may file a Notice on the docket. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8-11-2020. (lcckk3) (Entered: 08/11/2020)
2020-08-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/15/2020. (kt) (Entered: 08/11/2020)
2020-10-159Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-11-1610Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 11/16/2020)
2020-12-1511Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
2021-01-1412Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-02-1613Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 02/16/2021)
2021-03-1814Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar