Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Immigration Council et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2020cv03266
Date Filed2020-05-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu
PlaintiffAmerican Immigration Council
PlaintiffAmerican Immigration Lawyers Association
PlaintiffHuman Rights Watch
Case DescriptionThe American Immigration Council submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, and U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning the Migrant Protection Protocols requiring asylum-seekers to stay in Mexico until their cases were heard. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, AIC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantUnited States Customs and Border Protection
DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-131COMPLAINT For Declaratory And Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (no process) ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14468314.). Filed byAmerican Immigration Council, Human Rights Watch, American Immigration Lawyers Association. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Romm, Leah) (Filed on 5/13/2020) Modified on 5/14/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-05-142Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/28/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-143NOTICE of Appearance by John Erik Schreiber AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFFS (Schreiber, John) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-144NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan E. Stewart (Stewart, Morgan) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-145NOTICE of Appearance by Dillon Singh Kellerman (Kellerman, Dillon) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-146NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Enzminger (Enzminger, David) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-147Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-148Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 The main document is a proposed summons for U.S. Attorney General William Barr. Under FRCP Rule 4, Plaintiffs are required to serve summons on AG Barr for this type of FOIA litigation.)(Kellerman, Dillon) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-149Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 The main document is a proposed summons for U.S.A.O in the Northern District of California. Under FRCP Rule 4, Plaintiffs are required to serve summons on N.D. Cal. U.S.A.O. for this type of FOIA litigation.)(Kellerman, Dillon) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-1410Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 The main document is a proposed summons for defendant U.S. Customs and Border Protection.)(Kellerman, Dillon) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-1411Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 The main document is a proposed summons for defendant Immigration & Customs Enforcement of the Department of Homeland Security.)(Kellerman, Dillon) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-1412Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 The main document is a proposed summons for defendant U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services.)(Kellerman, Dillon) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-15Electronic filing error . Only ONE summons will be issued. Please list all defendants on ONE summons and re-file in its entirety. [err201] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety Re: 10 - 12 Proposed Summons filed by American Immigration Council, American Immigration Lawyers Association, Human Rights Watch. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)
2020-05-1513Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 This is a proposed summons for all Defendants to this case. Although not named in the complaint, U.S. Attorney General William Barr and the U.S.A.O. of the Northern District of California are required to be served summons by FRCP Rule 4 for this type of FOIA litigation.)(Kellerman, Dillon) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)
2020-05-1814Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-2015CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Immigration Council, American Immigration Lawyers Association, Human Rights Watch.. (Enzminger, David) (Filed on 5/20/2020) (Entered: 05/20/2020)
2020-05-2116CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Immigration Council, American Immigration Lawyers Association, Human Rights Watch (Enzminger, David) (Filed on 5/21/2020) (Entered: 05/21/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar