Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDALE v. UNITED STATES DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01248
Date Filed2020-05-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffCURTIS LEE DALE
DefendantUNITED STATES DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-11Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 05/11/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-111COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DRUG ENFORCEMENT AGENCY filed by CURTIS LEE DALE.(zsb) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-112MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CURTIS LEE DALE (zsb) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-223ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $150.00 from Prison Account of CURTIS LEE DALE and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 05/22/2020. (zmc) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-05-26Case assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zmc) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-05-294STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 05/29/20. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar