Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBUZZFEED, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01319
Date Filed2020-05-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffBUZZFEED, INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning communications to and from Deborah Birx, including attachments, sent by Marc Lipsitch of Harvard. BuzzFeed also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied BuzzFeed's request for expedited processing. BuzzFeed filed an administrative appeal of the agency's denial of its request for expedited processing. The agency denied BuzzFeed's appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, BuzzFeed filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-181COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7135497) filed by BUZZFEED, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-182NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED, INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-183LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED, INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-18Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-184SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-06-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 6/1/2020 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/1/2020. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-187RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/1/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/1/2020. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-07-018ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-07-02MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by July 31, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/2/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 7/31/2020. (zkh) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-319Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 07/31/2020)
2020-07-31MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by September 29, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/31/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 07/31/2020)
2020-09-2910Joint STATUS REPORT by BUZZFEED, INC.. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/29/2020)
2020-10-01MINUTE ORDER: On July 31, 2020, the Court ordered the parties to submit a joint status report no later than September 29 2020. The parties have not done so and the Court is in receipt of only 10 Plaintiff's status report. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, no later than October 5, 2020, the parties shall submit a joint status report apprising the Court of Defendant's progress processing Plaintiff's FOIA request. That report shall also address why the parties failed comply with the Court's prior deadline. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/01/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/5/2020. (zkh) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-0511Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-10-05MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by November 19, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/05/20.(lctjk2) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-11-2012Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
2020-11-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, no later than January 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/22/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 11/22/2020)
2021-01-1913Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-19MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, no later than March 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/19/21. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-03-0214NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 03/02/2021)
2021-03-2215Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-23MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, no later than April 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/23/21. (lctjk2) (Entered: 03/23/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar