Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEwing et al v. Farm Service Agency et al
DistrictNorthern District of Texas
CityAmarillo
Case Number2:2020cv00127
Date Filed2020-05-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn
PlaintiffDean Warren Ewing
PlaintiffLeslie Rene Ewing
Case DescriptionDean and Leslie Ewing filed suit against Department of Agriculture under the Administrative Procedure Act and the Privacy Act. This is not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantFarm Service Agency an agency within the U.S. Department of Agriculture
DefendantFarm Credit Administration an independent governmental agency
DefendantSonny Perdue in his official capacity as the Secretary of the U.S. Department of Agriculture
DefendantRichard Fordyce in his official capacity as Acting Administrator of the Farm Service Agency, an agency within the U.S. Department of Agriculture
DefendantGlen R Smith in his official capacity as Chairman and CEO of the Farm Credit Administration
DefendantRaylon Shumaker in his official capacity as Vice President of AgPreference Credit Association, a part of the Farm Credit Administration
DefendantRandy Sims
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-181COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Leslie Rene Ewing, Dean Warren Ewing. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10847255) Clerk to issue summonses for federal and non-federal defendants. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Newark, Robert) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-182CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dean Warren Ewing, Leslie Rene Ewing. (Newark, Robert) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-183New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (daa) (Entered: 05/19/2020)
2020-05-194Summons issued as to Farm Credit Administration, Farm Service Agency, Richard Fordyce, Sonny Perdue, Glen R Smith, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (daa) (Entered: 05/19/2020)
2020-05-195Summons Issued as to Raylon Shumaker, Randy Sims. (daa) (Entered: 05/19/2020)
2020-05-216STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE AND NOTICE OF OPTION TO CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 5/21/2020) (nhp) (Entered: 05/21/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar