Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01322
Date Filed2020-05-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Treasury for records concerning applications from fossil fuel companies for economic relief under the CARES Act. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CBD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DefendantBOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-191COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7137756) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Treasury, # 3 Summons AG, # 4 Summons US atty, # 5 LCvR 26.1)(Snape, William) Modified on 5/19/2020 to correct docket text (zsb). (Entered: 05/19/2020)
2020-05-192LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (zsb) (zsb). (Entered: 05/19/2020)
2020-05-19Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 05/19/2020)
2020-05-193SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 05/19/2020)
2020-05-224NOTICE of Appearance by Paulo Antonio Lopes on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Lopes, Paulo) (Entered: 05/22/2020)
2020-06-175AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Summons BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM)(Lopes, Paulo) (Entered: 06/17/2020)
2020-06-256SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM. (ztth) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-06-307NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Landrum von Bokern on behalf of All Defendants (von Bokern, Jordan) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-06-308Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(von Bokern, Jordan) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar