Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01331
Date Filed2020-05-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffBUZZFEED, INC.
Case DescriptionReporter Jason Leopold submitted FOIA requests to the Federal Election Commission, the Transportation Security Administration, U.S. Agency for International Development, and the Office of the Director of National Intelligence for records concerning issues related to the effects of the corona virus. Leopold also requested expedited processing. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests and all but the FEC granted Leopold's request for expedited processing; the FEC had not made a decision on expedition when Leopold filed suit. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION
DefendantTRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-191COMPLAINT against FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7139303) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet, # 12 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/19/2020)
2020-05-192NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/19/2020)
2020-05-193LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED, INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/19/2020)
2020-05-20Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (adh, ) (Entered: 05/20/2020)
2020-05-204SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/20/2020)
2020-06-115GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/11/2020. (jag) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-07-016NOTICE of Appearance by James O. Bickford on behalf of FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Bickford, James) (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-07-017ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Bickford, James) (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-07-02MINUTE ORDER. In light of the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic, and the associated difficulties that it is causing in workplaces, this Court is extending the standard period of time that it affords parties to submit proposed schedules for briefing or disclosure in FOIA cases following submission of an answer. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 7/29/2020, the parties shall confer and submit a proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/2/2020. (jag) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-228RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION served on 6/26/2020 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
2020-07-229RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE served on 6/1/2020 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
2020-07-2210RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION served on 6/1/2020 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
2020-07-2211RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/1/2020. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
2020-07-2212RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/1/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/1/2020. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
2020-07-2913Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 07/29/2020)
2020-07-30MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 9/15/2020, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/30/2020. (jag) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
2020-09-1514Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-10-15MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 10/15/2020, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/15/2020. (jag) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-1515Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-16MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 11/16/2020, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/16/2020. (jag) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-11-1616Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 11/16/2020)
2020-11-20MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 11/24/2020, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/20/2020. (jag) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
2020-11-2417Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-12-0218Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2020-12-07MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' [21 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 1/15/2021, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/7/2020. (jag) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2021-01-1519Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-18MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 2/19/2021, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/18/2021. (jag) (Entered: 01/18/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar