Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGreene v. U.S. Department of Justice et al
DistrictDistrict of Minnesota
CityDMN
Case Number0:2020cv01207
Date Filed2020-05-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Eric C. Tostrud
PlaintiffKyle Richard Greene
Case DescriptionKyle Greene submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Attorney's Office for the District of Minnesota for records concerning policies and regulations. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Greene filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
DefendantNatasha Hudgens FOIA Liaison
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-191COMPLAINT against Natasha Hudgens, U.S. Department of Justice (filing fee $400, receipt number 3-1015967) filed by Kyle Richard Greene. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C, # 4 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK) (Entered: 05/19/2020)
2020-05-192Summons Issued as to Natasha Hudgens, U.S. Department of Justice. (JGK) CC: Greene w/ Information Sheet. Modified text on 5/19/2020 (JGK). (Entered: 05/19/2020)
2020-05-263SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Kyle Richard Greene. Natasha Hudgens served on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; U.S. Department of Justice served on 5/20/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(MMP) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar