Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01343
Date Filed2020-05-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Services, Department of Treasury, Department of State, and OMB for records concerning communications between the agencies and White House Chief of Staff Mark Meadows and/or his staff. The agencies acknowledged the requests but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-201COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7142609) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Rasheed, Mehreen) (Entered: 05/20/2020)
2020-05-202LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Rasheed, Mehreen) (Entered: 05/20/2020)
2020-05-20Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, ) (Entered: 05/20/2020)
2020-05-203SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/20/2020)
2020-06-124RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/28/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/27/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/28/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 6/1/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 6/5/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 5/28/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 6/8/2020 (Rasheed, Mehreen) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-295ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-29MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by July 13, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 06/29/2020. (lccrc3) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar