Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01368
Date Filed2020-05-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Housing and Urban Development and the U.S. Interagency Council on Homelessness for records concerning communications between the agencies and Robert Marbut. DFF also requested a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
DefendantU.S. INTERAGENCY COUNCIL ON HOMELESSNESS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-211COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. INTERAGENCY COUNCIL ON HOMELESSNESS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7149022) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons)(Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 05/21/2020)
2020-05-212LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 05/21/2020)
2020-05-22Case assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmc) (Entered: 05/22/2020)
2020-05-223SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. INTERAGENCY COUNCIL ON HOMELESSNESS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 05/22/2020)
2020-05-264STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 26, 2020. (lcbah3) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-06-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT served on 6/1/2020; U.S. INTERAGENCY COUNCIL ON HOMELESSNESS served on 6/10/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/02/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/2/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/2/2020.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 06/16/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar