Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSanta Fe Dreamers Project v. U.S. Customs and Border Protection
DistrictDistrict of New Mexico
CityAlbuquerque
Case Number1:2020cv00490
Date Filed2020-05-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Laura Fashing
PlaintiffSanta Fe Dreamers Project
Case DescriptionSanta Fe Dreamers Project submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning inspections of Taylor Levy and Hector Ruiz at the El Paso port of entry. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told Santa Fe Dreamer Project that it located no records. Santa Fe Dreamers Project filed two administrative appeals but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Santa Fe Dreamer Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Customs and Border Protection
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-211COMPLAINT against U.S. Customs and Border Protection ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Santa Fe Dreamers Project. (Benoit, Christopher) (Entered: 05/21/2020)
2020-05-21Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7133150 re 1 Complaint filed by Santa Fe Dreamers Project (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Benoit, Christopher) (Entered: 05/21/2020)
2020-05-21United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (arp) (Entered: 05/21/2020)
2020-05-212PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp) (Entered: 05/21/2020)
2020-05-213NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet against U.S. Customs and Border Protection, filed by Santa Fe Dreamers Project. (Benoit, Christopher) Modified on 5/21/2020 (arp). (Entered: 05/21/2020)
2020-05-22Summons Issued as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dr) (Entered: 05/22/2020)
2020-06-014SUMMONS Returned Executed by Santa Fe Dreamers Project. U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Attorney's Office served on 5/26/2020, answer due 6/16/2020., (Benoit, Christopher) Modified docket text on 6/2/2020 (dr). Modified on 6/5/2020 (arp). (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-045SUMMONS Returned Executed by Santa Fe Dreamers Project. U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Attorney General served on 6/1/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Benoit, Christopher) Modified on 6/5/2020 (arp). (Entered: 06/04/2020)
2020-06-246ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. Customs and Border Protection. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Santa Fe Dreamers Project.(Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar