Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS UNITED v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01376
Date Filed2020-05-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffCITIZENS UNITED
Case DescriptionCitizens United submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning a December 2016 meeting between former State Department official Kathleen Kavalec and former Justice Department official Bruce Ohr. Citizens United also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Citizens United filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-221COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7151511) filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Summons to the Attorney General, # 6 Summons to the State Dept, # 7 Summons to the US Attorney)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 05/22/2020)
2020-05-222LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS UNITED (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 05/22/2020)
2020-05-22Case assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmc) (Entered: 05/22/2020)
2020-05-223SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 05/22/2020)
2020-06-304NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell C. Valdez on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-06-305ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-06-306ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before July 28, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/30/2020. (lcabj3) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-06-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff by 7/28/2020. (jth) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar