Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKIND INC. v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01384
Date Filed2020-05-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffKIND INC.
doing business as KIDS IN NEED OF DEFENSE
Case DescriptionKids in Need of Defense (KIND) submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning a Redetermination Memo pertaining to asylum applications for alien minors. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, KIND filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-221COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7154217) filed by KIND INC., d/b/a KIDS IN NEED OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons)(Burgess, Brian) (Entered: 05/22/2020)
2020-05-222LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by KIND INC., d/b/a KIDS IN NEED OF DEFENSE (Burgess, Brian) (Entered: 05/22/2020)
2020-05-223NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by KIND INC., d/b/a KIDS IN NEED OF DEFENSE. Case related to Case No. 8:19-cv-01944 (D. Md.). (Burgess, Brian) (Entered: 05/22/2020)
2020-05-224MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Elaine Herrmann Blais, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7154377. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by KIND INC., d/b/a KIDS IN NEED OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Elaine Herrmann Blais, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Brian) (Entered: 05/22/2020)
2020-05-225MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joel L. Broussard, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7154386. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by KIND INC., d/b/a KIDS IN NEED OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joel L. Broussard, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Brian) (Entered: 05/22/2020)
2020-05-226MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Wendy T. Wylegala, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7154391. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by KIND INC., d/b/a KIDS IN NEED OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Wendy T. Wylegala, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Burgess, Brian) (Entered: 05/22/2020)
2020-05-26Case assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zmc) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-05-267SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-05-27MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's 4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elaine Herrmann Blais, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Elaine Herrmann Blais is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice . Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 27, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 05/27/2020)
2020-05-27MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's 5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joel L. Broussard, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Joel L. Broussard is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice . Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 27, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 05/27/2020)
2020-05-27MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's 6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Wendy T. Wylegala, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Wendy T. Wylegala is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice . Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 27, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 05/27/2020)
2020-05-278NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy Wylegala on behalf of KIND INC. (Wylegala, Wendy) (Entered: 05/27/2020)
2020-05-289NOTICE of Appearance by Joel L. Broussard on behalf of KIND INC. (Broussard, Joel) (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-05-2810NOTICE of Appearance by Elaine H. Blais on behalf of KIND INC. (Blais, Elaine) (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-06-1911RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/1/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/1/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 6/1/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Burgess, Brian) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-06-2512ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES.(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar