Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF PENNSYLVANIA et al v. UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictEastern District of Pennsylvania
CityPhiladelphia
Case Number2:2020cv02363
Date Filed2020-05-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeCHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF PENNSYLVANIA
PlaintiffFarmworker Legal Aid Clinic
Case DescriptionThe ACLU of Pennsylvania and the Farmworker Legal Aid Clinic submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning Form deportation applications filed by ICE's Philadelphia Field Office. The ACLU of Pennsylvania also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted the ACLU of Pennsylvania's request for expedited processing. The agency told the ACLU of Pennsylvania that it would not disclose information about third parties without authorization. The ACLU of Pennsylvania filed an administrative appeal. The appeal was denied. The ACLU of Pennsylvania then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-201COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14302541.), filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF PENNSYLVANIA, Farmworker Legal Aid Clinic. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Designation Form, # 3 Track Designation Form, # 4 Proposed Summons, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E)(GROGAN, JOHN) (Entered: 05/20/2020)
2020-05-20Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General EMAILED To: COUNSEL and US ATTORNEYS on 5/20/20 (jaa, ) (Entered: 05/20/2020)
2020-05-212Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (jaa, ) (Entered: 05/21/2020)
2020-06-173APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Muneeba S. Talukder by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF PENNSYLVANIA, Farmworker Legal Aid Clinic. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14358678.). (STINE, VANESSA) (Entered: 06/17/2020)
2020-06-184ORDERED THE APPLICATION OF MUNEEBA S. TALUKDER, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 6/18/20. 6/18/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-225ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(DEBRUICKER, LAUREN) Modified on 6/23/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 06/22/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar