Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJarrell v. Dept. of the Army
DistrictSouthern District of Ohio
CityDayton
Case Number3:2020cv00194
Date Filed2020-05-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Walter H. Rice
PlaintiffStephen P. Jarrell
Case DescriptionStephen Jarrell filed suit against the Department of the Army alleging misuse of information by the Army Review Board. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantArmy Review Boards Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-261COMPLAINT against Army Review Boards Agency, filed by Stephen P. Jarrell. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A-J, # 3 Envelope) (jmb) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-05-262Summons Issued as to Department of the Army, Army Review Boards Agency, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jmb) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-05-263Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 300DAY23778 (pb) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-06-154SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Army Review Boards Agency. Army Review Boards Agency served on 5/30/2020, answer due 8/30/2020. (pb) Modified on 6/16/2020 (pb). (Entered: 06/15/2020)
2020-06-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Army Review Boards Agency answer due 8/31/2020. (pb) (Entered: 06/16/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar