Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01400
Date Filed2020-05-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted two FOIA requests to Department of Homeland Security for records concerning expenses incurred by U.S. Secret Service in providing protection for Donald Trump Jr. CREW's first request asked for the cost of security for Trump's travel to Mongolia in 2019. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency provided two pages containing expenses. CREW filed an administrative appeal, arguing that the agency had not conducted an adequate search. In its second request, CREW asked for a report prepared by the Office of the Inspector General pertaining to Secret Service expenses incurred in a trip to Trump's Turnberry Resort in Ireland. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The OIG told CREW that the Secret Service was asserting Exemption 7(E) (investigative methods and techniques) and Exemption 7(F) (harm to any person) to redact information. CREW filed an administrative appeal of that decision as well. After hearing nothing further the agency pertaining to either request, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-271COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7164649) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Dep't of Homeland Security, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 05/27/2020)
2020-05-272ERRATA by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON 1 Complaint, filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons U.S. Dep't of Homeland Security)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 05/27/2020)
2020-05-273LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 05/27/2020)
2020-05-28Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, ) (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-05-284SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-06-175RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/9/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/9/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 6/8/2020 (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 06/17/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar