Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC. et al v. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01408
Date Filed2020-05-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffAMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC.
PlaintiffBENJAMIN GITTLESON
Case DescriptionABC News Reporter Benjamin Gittleson submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning emails pertaining to the change on the agency's webpage on the Strategic National Stockpile. Gittleson also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Gittleson subsequently amended his request to ask for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, ABC News filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-271COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7166819) filed by AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., Benjamin Gittleson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 LCvR 26.1 Certificate, # 4 Summons as to Department of Health and Human Services, # 5 Summons as to U.S. Attorney, # 6 Summons as to United States Attorney General)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/2/2020) (rj). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/2/2020) (rj). (Entered: 05/27/2020)
2020-05-272LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., BENJAMIN GITTLESON (adh, ) (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-05-28Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (adh, ) (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-05-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-05-294STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 29, 2020. (lcbah3) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-06-035RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/3/20., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/3/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/3/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 6/3/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of mailing for Department of Health and Human Services, # 2 Affidavit of mailing for United States Attorney, # 3 Affidavit of mailing for United States Attorney General)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 06/03/2020)
2020-06-156NOTICE of Appearance by Amy E. Powell on behalf of All Defendants (Powell, Amy) (Entered: 06/15/2020)
2020-06-167NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Alexander Marshall on behalf of AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., BENJAMIN GITTLESON (Marshall, Adam) (Entered: 06/16/2020)
2020-07-028ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Powell, Amy) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar