Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleContreras & Metelska, P.A. v. U.S. Department of Justice et al
DistrictDistrict of Minnesota
CityDMN
Case Number0:2020cv01261
Date Filed2020-05-27
Date Closed2020-06-29
JudgeJudge Susan Richard Nelson
PlaintiffContreras & Metelska, P.A.
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Contreras & Metelska submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning a federation agreement between the Executive Office for Immigration Review and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told the law firm that its request qualified for unusual circumstances and would take some time to process. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Contreras & Metelska filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
DefendantExecutive Office for Immigration Review
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-271COMPLAINT against Executive Office for Immigration Review, U.S. Department of Justice (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7754404) filed by Contreras & Metelska, P.A.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ratkowski, Nicholas) Modified text on 5/27/2020 (MMP). (Entered: 05/27/2020)
2020-05-272TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherian M. Menedez. Please use case number 20-cv-1261 (SRN/KMM). (MMP) (Entered: 05/27/2020)
2020-05-273Summons Issued as to Executive Office for Immigration Review, U.S. Department of Justice. (MMP) (Entered: 05/27/2020)
2020-05-274SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Contreras & Metelska, P.A.. Executive Office for Immigration Review served on 5/27/2020, answer due 7/27/2020; U.S. Department of Justice served on 5/27/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Ratkowski, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/27/2020)
2020-06-105NOTICE of Appearance by Ann M Bildtsen on behalf of Executive Office for Immigration Review, U.S. Department of Justice. (Bildtsen, Ann) (Entered: 06/10/2020)
2020-06-266STIPULATION of Dismissal by Executive Office for Immigration Review, U.S. Department of Justice. Jointly Signed by Contreras & Metelska, P.A.. (Bildtsen, Ann) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-267PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re 6 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Bildtsen, Ann) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-298ORDER DISMISSING CASE re 6 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 6/29/2020.(SMD) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-299JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Civil Notice - appeal)(MMG) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar