Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT v. US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01415
Date Filed2020-05-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffPROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionThe Project on Government Oversight submitted five FOIA requests to the Office of Legal Counsel at the Department of Justice for records concerning various OLC opinions. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. For those FOIA requests for which it completed processing, OLC denied access to the opinions based on Exemption 5 (privileges). The agency acknowledged receipt of POGO's fifth request but had not responded to it before POGO filed suit. As to those requests that were denied, POGO filed administrative appeals. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of its requests, POGO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Office of Legal Counsel
DefendantUS DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
Complaint attachment 28
Complaint attachment 29
Complaint attachment 30
Complaint attachment 31
Complaint attachment 32
Complaint attachment 33
Complaint attachment 34
Complaint attachment 35
Complaint attachment 36
Complaint attachment 37
Complaint attachment 38
Complaint attachment 39
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-281COMPLAINT against US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7170237) filed by PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons OLC, # 3 Summons USAG, # 4 Summons USAO, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit L, # 17 Exhibit M, # 18 Exhibit N, # 19 Exhibit O, # 20 Exhibit P, # 21 Exhibit Q, # 22 Exhibit R, # 23 Exhibit S, # 24 Exhibit T, # 25 Exhibit U, # 26 Exhibit V, # 27 Exhibit W, # 28 Exhibit X, # 29 Exhibit Y, # 30 Exhibit Z, # 31 Exhibit AA, # 32 Exhibit BB, # 33 Exhibit CC, # 34 Exhibit DD, # 35 Exhibit EE, # 36 Exhibit FF, # 37 Exhibit GG, # 38 Exhibit HH, # 39 Exhibit II)(Nabatoff, Ross) (adh, ). (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-05-282ERRATA re Civil Cover Sheet by PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT 1 Complaint,,, filed by PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Civil Cover Sheet)(Nabatoff, Ross) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/8/2020) (znmw). (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-05-29Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, ) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-05-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-06-064NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Burch on behalf of US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 06/06/2020)
2020-06-125RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/5/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/5/2020. (Nabatoff, Ross) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-126RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/5/20. (Nabatoff, Ross) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-127RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/5/2020 (Nabatoff, Ross) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar