Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01421
Date Filed2020-05-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffPROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT, INC.
Case DescriptionThe Project on Government Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning whether the agency employed any retired military officers in violation of the Emoluments clause of the Constitution. POGO also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted POGO's request for a fee waiver. The agency told POGO that it had a backlog of more than 10,000 requests and would not be able to respond within the statutory time limit. POGO then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantUS DEPARTMENT OF STATE
600 19th Street, NW
Suite 5.600
Washington, DC 20522
DefendantUS DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-281COMPLAINT against US DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7171322) filed by PROJECT ON GOVERNMENT OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons State, # 3 Summons USAG, # 4 Summons USAO, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit L, # 17 Exhibit M, # 18 Exhibit N, # 19 Exhibit O, # 20 Exhibit P)(Nabatoff, Ross) (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-05-29Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (adh, ) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-05-292SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to US DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-06-123RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/5/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/5/2020. (Nabatoff, Ross) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-124RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/5/20. (Nabatoff, Ross) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-205NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 06/20/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar