Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleREAL CLEAR INVESTIGATIONS, LLC et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01422
Date Filed2020-05-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffREAL CLEAR INVESTIGATIONS, LLC
PlaintiffERIC FELTEN
Case DescriptionReporter Eric Felten of Real Clear Investigations, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning any memos written by Christopher Steele and any agency records referring to the Steele memorandum. Felten also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied Felten's request for expedited processing. Felten filed an administrative appeal of the agency's denial of his request for expedited processing. The agency denied the appeal. Felten then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-291COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7173395) filed by REAL CLEAR INVESTIGATIONS, LLC, ERIC FELTEN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney's Office, # 3 Summons for the Attorney General, # 4 Summons for the agency, the State Department, # 5 Summons for State Department Legal Adviser)(Bader, Hans) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-05-292LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by REAL CLEAR INVESTIGATIONS, LLC (Bader, Hans) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-05-293ERRATA to signature page of Complaint and to electronic signature on LCvR 26.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ERIC FELTEN, REAL CLEAR INVESTIGATIONS, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Errata to Complaint signature page, # 2 Errata to LCvR 26.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement signature)(Bader, Hans) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-05-29Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, ) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-05-294SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-06-225RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/4/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/4/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/2/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 6/3/2020 (Bader, Hans) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar