Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleShaklee & Oliver PS et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2020cv00806
Date Filed2020-05-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Richard A. Jones
PlaintiffShaklee & Oliver PS
PlaintiffJonathan Shaklee
Case DescriptionJonathan Shaklee of the law firm of Shaklee & Oliver submitted three FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning Alien Files for his clients. The agency acknowledged receipt the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Shaklee filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-291COMPLAINT against defendant(s) United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Receipt # BWAWDC-6368324) Attorney Gregory Hortman McLawsen added to party Jonathan Shaklee(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory Hortman McLawsen added to party Shaklee & Oliver, P.S.(pty:pla), filed by Shaklee & Oliver, P.S., Jonathan Shaklee.(McLawsen, Gregory) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-05-292CIVIL COVER SHEET re 1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiffs Jonathan Shaklee, Shaklee & Oliver, P.S.. (McLawsen, Gregory) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-05-293PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re 1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Jonathan Shaklee, Shaklee & Oliver, P.S. (Attachments: # 1 Summons U.S. D.H.S., # 2 Summons Office of Attorney General, # 3 Summons USCIS Office of Chief Counsel, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General - Seattle)(McLawsen, Gregory) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-06-01Judge Richard A. Jones added. (SG) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-014Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(SG) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-015STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-02NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/9/2020. (SG) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-06-026AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to USCIS Office of Chief Counsel on 6/2/2020, filed by Plaintiffs Jonathan Shaklee, Shaklee & Oliver PS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service U.S. A.G. - D.C., # 2 Certificate of Service Dept. Homeland Security, # 3 Certificate of Service USCIC - OCC, # 4 Certificate of Service U.S. Attorney General - Seattle)(McLawsen, Gregory) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-06-037CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Shaklee & Oliver PS (McLawsen, Gregory) (Entered: 06/03/2020)
2020-06-308NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar