Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRich v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2020cv00813
Date Filed2020-05-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James L. Robart
PlaintiffKatherine Honor Rich
Case DescriptionKatherine Rich, an attorney, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning the adjustment of status interview that her client had with the agency. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Rich filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-291COMPLAINT against defendant(s) United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Receipt # AWAWDC-6369273) Attorney Gregory Hortman McLawsen added to party Katherine Honor Rich(pty:pla), filed by Katherine Honor Rich. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Summons USCIS Office of Chief Counsel, # 4 Summons Dept. Homeland Security, # 5 Summons U.S. Atty. Gen. - Seattle Office)(McLawsen, Gregory) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-06-02Judge James L. Robart added. (RE) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-06-022Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s). (Attachments: # 1 Summons-USCIS, # 2 Summons-Dept of Health and Human Services, # 3 Summons-US Attorney Seattle)(RE) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-06-023AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to USCIS Office of Chief Counsel on 6/2/2020, filed by Plaintiff Katherine Honor Rich. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service DHS - OGC, # 2 Certificate of Service US AG - Seattle, # 3 Certificate of Service US AG - D.C.)(McLawsen, Gregory) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-06-304NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar