Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleVoice of San Diego v. Federal Communications Commission et al
DistrictSouthern District of California
CitySan Diego
Case Number3:2020cv00990
Date Filed2020-05-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Janis L. Sammartino
PlaintiffVoice of San Diego
Case DescriptionVoice of San Diego submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Aviation Administration and the Federal Communications Commission for records concerning applications filed proposing and seeking permission to test drone technologies in the skies of California. Voice of San Diego also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the request and asked Voice of San Diego to narrow its request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Voice of San Diego filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Expedited processing, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantFederal Communications Commission
DefendantFederal Aviation Administration
DefendantU.S. Department of Transportation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [15]
Opinion/Order [17]
Opinion/Order [23]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-291COMPLAINT against Federal Aviation Administration, Federal Communications Commission, U.S. Department of Transportation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13936348.), filed by Voice of San Diego. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D) The new case number is 3:20-cv-990-JLS-NLS. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Burke, Thomas)(smd) (sjt). (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-05-292Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-05-293NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Voice of San Diego . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Burke, Thomas) (jpp). (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-06-024NOTICE of Appearance by Monder Khoury on behalf of Voice of San Diego (Khoury, Monder)Attorney Monder Khoury added to party Voice of San Diego(pty:pla) (jpp). (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-07-025SUMMONS Returned Executed by Voice of San Diego. U.S. Department of Transportation served. (Khoury, Monder) (jpp). (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-026SUMMONS Returned Executed by Voice of San Diego. Federal Aviation Administration served. (Khoury, Monder) (jpp). (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-027SUMMONS Returned Executed by Voice of San Diego. Federal Communications Commission served. (Khoury, Monder) (jpp). (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-228ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Federal Aviation Administration, Federal Communications Commission, U.S. Department of Transportation. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Gardner, Leslie)Attorney Leslie Marie Gardner added to party Federal Aviation Administration(pty:dft), Attorney Leslie Marie Gardner added to party Federal Communications Commission(pty:dft), Attorney Leslie Marie Gardner added to party U.S. Department of Transportation(pty:dft) (jpp). (Entered: 07/22/2020)
2020-08-039NOTICE AND ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference for 9/2/2020 at 10:00am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 8/03/2020.(jpp) (dlg). (Entered: 08/03/2020)
2020-09-0210Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 9/2/2020. Case did not settle. Order to issue. (Plaintiff Attorneys Monder Khoury; Thomas Burke). (Defendant Attorney Leslie Gardner). (no document attached) (twa) (Entered: 09/02/2020)
2020-09-0211Order: (1) Following Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; and (2) Setting Status/Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 9/02/2020. Status/Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2020 at 10:00am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 9/02/2020.(jpp) (Entered: 09/02/2020)
2020-10-1612STATUS REPORT and EX PARTE Request to Modify Production Deadline for Portion of FAA FOIA Response by Federal Aviation Administration, Federal Communications Commission, U.S. Department of Transportation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Exhibit A, # 2 Declaration Exhibit B, # 3 Declaration Exhibit C)(Gardner, Leslie) (tcf). (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-1913RESPONSE re 12 Status Report, Opposition to Ex Parte Request to Modify Production Deadline for Portion of FAA FOIA Response filed by Voice of San Diego. (Burke, Thomas) (tcf). (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-10-2114Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: Status Conference held on 10/21/2020. Order to issue.(Plaintiff Attorney Thomas Burke). (Defendant Attorney Leslie Gardner). (no document attached) (twa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-2115ORDER: (1) Following Status Conference; (2) Granting in Part and Denying in Part 12 Defendants' Ex Parte Request to Modify Production Deadline; and (2) Setting Continued Status/Case Management Conference. The parties shall file a joint Status Report with the Court on 12/14/2020. The Court SETS a status/case management conference for 12/16/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. This conference will be held via videoconference with counsel only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 10/21/2020. (tcf) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-12-1416STATUS REPORT JOINT Status Report and JOINT Request to Continue Status Conference by Federal Aviation Administration, Federal Communications Commission, U.S. Department of Transportation. (Gardner, Leslie) (tcf). (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2020-12-1517ORDER Vacating and Resetting Continued Status/Case Management Conference. By 1/14/2021 the parties shall file an updated joint status report with the Court. The status conference set for December 16, 2020 is VACATED and RESET for 1/21/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 12/15/2020. (tcf) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
2021-01-1418STATUS REPORT JOINT by Federal Aviation Administration, Federal Communications Commission, U.S. Department of Transportation. (Gardner, Leslie) (tcf). (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-2019MINUTE ORDER: Status/Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2021 is VACATED and RESET For 3/10/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 1/20/2021.(no document attached) (twa) (Entered: 01/20/2021)
2021-01-2120Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: For the status/case management hearing, by no later than 3/5/2021, the parties shall (1) file an updated joint status report with the Court; and (2) email the Court at efile_stormes@casd.uscourts.gov to identify the name and title of everyone who will be attending the Zoom status conference, an e-mail address for each participant to receive the Zoom invitation, and a telephone number where each participant may be reached in the event of technical issues. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 1/21/2021.(twa) (Entered: 01/21/2021)
2021-03-0521STATUS REPORT Joint by Federal Aviation Administration. (Gardner, Leslie) (tcf). (Entered: 03/05/2021)
2021-03-1022Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes: Status Conference held on 3/10/2021. Order to issue. (Plaintiff Attorney Monder Khoury). (Defendant Attorney Leslie Gardner). (no document attached) (twa) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-1023ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff shall file its motion for attorney's fees by May 10, 2021. Defendants shall respond by May 24, 2021. Plaintiff shall file a reply by June 1, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 3/10/2021. (tcf) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar