Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePangea Legal Services v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2020cv03619
Date Filed2020-06-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Richard Seeborg
PlaintiffPangea Legal Services
Case DescriptionPangea Legal Services submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning a change in the agency's policy and procedures for adjudicating I-730 Petitions. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Pangea Legal Services filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-011COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14523315.). Filed byPangea Legal Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit DHS Transfer Letter, # 3 Exhibit USCIS Receipt Notice - 433, # 4 Exhibit USCIS Receipt Notice - 426, # 5 Exhibit Pangea Email to USCIS, # 6 Exhibit USCIS Email Response to Pangea, # 7 Exhibit OIG Final Response)(Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 6/1/2020) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-012Civil Cover Sheet by Pangea Legal Services . (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 6/1/2020) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-013Proposed Summons. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 6/1/2020) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-014Proposed Summons. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 6/1/2020) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-015Proposed Summons. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 6/1/2020) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-016Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/15/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-017NOTICE of Appearance by Etan Z Newman (Newman, Etan) (Filed on 6/1/2020) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-018NOTICE of Appearance by Marie Anne Julie Vincent (Vincent, Marie) (Filed on 6/1/2020) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-019CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pangea Legal Services.. (Newman, Etan) (Filed on 6/1/2020) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-0110Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-0111Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Supplement)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-0112CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-0213ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 6/2/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-06-0214CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 10:00 AM to be held telephonic before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. All parties must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference. Case Management Statement due by 8/27/2020. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-06-1615AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint and Other Documents served on Defendant, Attorney General of the United States, U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of California on 06/04/2020, filed by Pangea Legal Services. (Newman, Etan) (Filed on 6/16/2020) (Entered: 06/16/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar