Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTOBIAS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01444
Date Filed2020-06-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffJIMMY TOBIAS
Case DescriptionJournalist Jimmy Tobias submitted 13 FOIA requests to the Department of Interior for records concerning communications to and from senior officials at the agency pertaining to a number of issues, such as climate change and the agency's response to the pandemic. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of his requests, Tobias filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-011COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7180032) filed by JIMMY TOBIAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E, # 2 Exhibit F-J, # 3 Exhibit K-O, # 4 Exhibit P-T, # 5 Exhibit U-Y, # 6 Exhibit Z-EE, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons)(Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-012NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of JIMMY TOBIAS (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-013NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of JIMMY TOBIAS (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-01Case assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmc) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-014SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-07-135ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR.(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-07-156ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before August 12, 2020.SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/15/2020. (lcabj3) (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff by 8/12/2020. (jth) (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-277RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR served on 6/10/2020 (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 07/27/2020)
2020-07-278RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/11/2020. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 07/27/2020)
2020-07-279RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/11/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/11/2020. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 07/27/2020)
2020-08-1210Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-13MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 10 joint status report, the parties must submit another status report by October 13, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/13/2020. (lcabj3) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-10-1311Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-10-14MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 11 joint status report, the parties must submit another status report by December 11, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/14/2020. (lcabj2) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-12-1112Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 12/11/2020)
2020-12-14MINUTE ORDER. MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 12 joint status report, the parties must submit another status report by February 11, 2021. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/14/20. (lcabj2) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2021-02-1113Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-12MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 13 joint status report, the parties must submit another status report by April 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/12/21. (lcabj2) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
2021-02-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/12/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
2021-04-0814Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 04/08/2021)
2021-04-09MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 14 joint status report, the parties must submit another status report by June 11, 2021. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/9/21. (lcabj2) (Entered: 04/09/2021)
2021-06-1115Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 06/11/2021)
2021-06-21MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 15 joint status report, the parties must submit another status report by September 9, 2021. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/21/21. (lcabj2) (Entered: 06/21/2021)
2021-06-2816NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR Substituting for attorney Kristin Brudy-Everett (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 06/28/2021)
2021-09-0917Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 09/09/2021)
2021-09-10MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 17 joint status report, the parties must submit another status report by January 20, 2022. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/10/21. (lcabj2) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar