Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSTONEHILL v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01445
Date Filed2020-06-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffPAULINE DALE STONEHILL Co-Executor and Co-Special Administrator, Estate of Harry S. Stonehill
Case DescriptionPauline Stonehill, the co-executor of the estate of Harry Stonehill, submitted three FOIA requests to the FBI for records concerning the participation of the Philippine National Bureau of Investigation in an investigation of Harry Stonehill that were located in response to a request from investigative journalist Bethany McLean. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of her requests, Stonehill filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-011COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by PAULINE DALE STONEHILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons)(Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-01Case assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmc) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-012SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-243RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/23/2020. (Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-244ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/23/2020. (Heggestad, Robert) Modified on 6/26/2020 (eg). (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-245RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 6/23/2020 (Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-26NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 4 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General was entered in error as a duplicate to docket entry 3 . (eg) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar