Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHooker v. Wilkie et al
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityTampa
Case Number8:2020cv01248
Date Filed2020-06-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge William F. Jung
PlaintiffCarlton E. Hooker, Jr.
Case DescriptionCarlton Hooker submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning hiring decisions. The agency failed to respond to his requests and Hooker filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantRobert Wilkie Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs
DefendantWilliam Barr Attorney General, United States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-011COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA61033) filed by Carlton E. Hooker, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Supplement)(MCB) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-012SUMMONS issued as to William Barr and Robert Wilkie.(MCB) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-013MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for access to CM/ECF by Carlton E. Hooker, Jr. (MCB) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-044ORDER denying 3 Plaintiff's Request for Access to CM/ECF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 6/4/2020. (AHA) (Entered: 06/04/2020)
2020-06-095RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/9/2020. (SAO) (Entered: 06/09/2020)
2020-06-156NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Carlton E. Hooker, Jr. Related case(s): yes (JLD) (Entered: 06/15/2020)
2020-06-157CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Carlton E. Hooker, Jr. (JLD) (Entered: 06/15/2020)
2020-07-028MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Leuthauser, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-029NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by William Barr, Robert Wilkie. Related case(s): Yes (Leuthauser, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-0210CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 5 Related case order and track 2 notice by William Barr, Robert Wilkie. (Leuthauser, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar