Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMcDaniels v. Verizon Wireless
DistrictDistrict of Minnesota
CityDMN
Case Number0:2020cv01311
Date Filed2020-06-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge John R. Tunheim
PlaintiffDarnell McDaniels
DefendantVerizon Wireless
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-041NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Third Judicial District (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7775865) filed by Verizon Wireless. No summons requested. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Callanan, Matthew) Modified text on 6/4/2020 (MMP). Modified text on 6/4/2020 (MMP). (Entered: 06/04/2020)
2020-06-042TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd 4th Master List list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 20-cv-1311 (JRT/BRT). (MMP) (Entered: 06/04/2020)
2020-06-103MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Verizon Wireless. ALL ATTACHMENTS FILED IN ERROR - ATTORNEY TO REFILE - (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Hearing, # 2 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 3 L.R. 7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 4 Meet and Confer Statement)(Callanan, Matthew) Modified text on 6/11/2020 (MMP). (Entered: 06/10/2020)
2020-06-114NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 3 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined. (Callanan, Matthew) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-115MEMORANDUM in Support re 3 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Verizon Wireless. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Callanan, Matthew) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-116MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 3 Motion to Dismiss/General, filed by Verizon Wireless.(Callanan, Matthew) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-127ORDER REFERRING 3 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Verizon Wireless to Judge Becky R. Thorson Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 6/12/2020.(HAZ) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-179BRIEFING ORDER re: 3 Motion to Dismiss/General, Responses due by 7/10/2020 Replies due by 7/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/17/2020. (DMM) (Entered: 06/17/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar