Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJAMES MADISON PROJECT et al v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01488
Date Filed2020-06-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffJAMES MADISON PROJECT
PlaintiffJOSH GERSTEIN
Case DescriptionThe James Madison Project and reporter Josh Gerstein submitted FOIA requests to the CIA, the other agencies that are part of the intelligence community for records concerning requests for unmasking the identities of U.S. citizens referenced in foreign intelligence reports. JMP and Gerstein also requested expedited processing. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, JMP and Gerstein filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Defendant2255
CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Washington, DC 20505
2255
DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
2255
OFFICE OF DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Washington, DC 20511
2255
DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
1000 Defense Pentagon
Washington, DC 20301-1000
2255
DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Office of the Legal Adviser
600 19th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20522
2255
DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
1500 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20220
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantOFFICE OF DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-061COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7202092) filed by THE JAMES MADISON PROJECT, JOSH GERSTEIN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Rule 7.1 certification, # 3 Summons CIA, # 4 Summons DoD, # 5 Summons DOJ, # 6 Summons ODNI, # 7 Summons State, # 8 Summons Treasury, # 9 Summons USADC, # 10 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 06/06/2020)
2020-06-062LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JOSH GERSTEIN, THE JAMES MADISON PROJECT (adh, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)
2020-06-08Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)
2020-06-083SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 06/08/2020)
2020-06-224RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 6/15/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CIA receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-225RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/12/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DOJ receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-226RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 6/11/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DOD receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-227RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE served on 6/12/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ODNI receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-228RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 6/12/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit State receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-229RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 6/15/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Treasury receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-2210RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/12/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USAG receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-2211RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/12/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/12/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USADC receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-2412MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by JOSH GERSTEIN, JAMES MADISON PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A - redlined FAC, # 3 Exhibit B - clean FAC, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-24MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion is GRANTED and that they may file a First Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/24/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-2513AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by JAMES MADISON PROJECT, JOSH GERSTEIN.(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-07-1314NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Evan Borson on behalf of All Defendants (Borson, Joseph) (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-07-1315ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE.(Borson, Joseph) (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-07-13MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before July 27, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/13/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-07-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 7/27/2020. (tj) (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-07-2716Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Borson, Joseph) (Entered: 07/27/2020)
2020-07-28MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 16 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before August 10, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/28/2020.(lcrc2) (Entered: 07/28/2020)
2020-07-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/10/2020. (tj) (Entered: 07/28/2020)
2020-07-3117NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Steven Zaid on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 07/31/2020)
2020-08-1018Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Borson, Joseph) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-08-10MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 18 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before September 9, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/10/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-08-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/9/2020. (tj) (Entered: 08/11/2020)
2020-09-0919STATUS REPORT by JOSH GERSTEIN, JAMES MADISON PROJECT. (Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 09/09/2020)
2020-09-10MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 19 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before October 10, 2020. Plaintiffs may file a motion to expedite whenever they wish. However, while the subject matter of this request addresses a very important issue for historical purposes, in the context of the pandemic footing on which the government is operating, the Court is presently not inclined to have the government drop everything in order to focus on these requests for purposes of meeting an election schedule. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/10/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/10/2020)
2020-09-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/10/2020. (tj) (Entered: 09/29/2020)
2020-10-0920Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Borson, Joseph) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-10-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 20 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before November 10, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/11/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/11/2020)
2020-10-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/10/2020 (tj) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-11-1021Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Borson, Joseph) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2020-11-10MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 21 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before December 10, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/10/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2020-11-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/10/2020. (tj) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-12-1022Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Borson, Joseph) (Entered: 12/10/2020)
2020-12-10MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 22 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before January 11, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/10/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/10/2020)
2021-01-1123Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Borson, Joseph) (Entered: 01/11/2021)
2021-01-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 23 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before March 12, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/11/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/11/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar