Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA v. UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01497
Date Filed2020-06-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Case DescriptionThe American Civil Liberties Union of the District of Columbia submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Secret Service for records concerning video recordings of the July 4, 2019 arrest of Gregory Johnson outside the White House for burning two flags. The charges were subsequently dropped. The ACLU of D.C. also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU of D.C. filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantUNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-081COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7207002) filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Secret Service, # 3 Summons to Attorney General, # 4 Summons to U.S. Attorney for D.C., # 5 Corporate disclosure certificate)(Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 06/08/2020)
2020-06-082LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (zmc) (Entered: 06/09/2020)
2020-06-09Case assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zmc) (Entered: 06/09/2020)
2020-06-093SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 06/09/2020)
2020-06-184RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE served on 6/12/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/15/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/15/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/15/2020.) (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar