Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleVanessa F. Edwards v. U.S. Customs and Border Protection, et al
DistrictSouthern District of Texas
CityMcAllen
Case Number7:2020cv00150
Date Filed2020-06-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ricardo H Hinojosa
PlaintiffVanessa F Edwards
DefendantU.S. Customs and Border Protection
DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantU.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security Office of Inspector General
DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security Office of Biometrics Identity Management
DefendantU.S. Deparment of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-091COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24775158) filed by VANESSA F EDWARDS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit)(Natarajan, Ranjana) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/10/2020) (klopez, 7). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/10/2020) (klopez, 7). (Entered: 06/09/2020)
2020-06-092ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/10/2020 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa(by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7) (Entered: 06/09/2020)
2020-06-113Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: # 1 US. Dept. of Homeland Security Summons, # 2 U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security Summons, # 3 Immigration and Customs Enforcement Summons, # 4 Immigration and Customs Enforcement Summons, # 5 U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security Off. of Biometrics Identity Mgmt Summons, # 6 U.S. Dept. of Homeland Security Off. of Inspector General Summons, # 7 U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services Summons)(Natarajan, Ranjana) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-114Summons Issued as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Deparment of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Homeland Security Office of Biometrics Identity Management, U.S. Department of Homeland Security Office of Inspector General, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(kanelson, 7) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-295CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vanessa F Edwards, filed.(Natarajan, Ranjana) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-296CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vanessa F Edwards, filed.(Natarajan, Ranjana) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-297CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vanessa F Edwards, filed.(Natarajan, Ranjana) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-298CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vanessa F Edwards, filed.(Natarajan, Ranjana) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-299CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vanessa F Edwards, filed.(Natarajan, Ranjana) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar