Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBUZZFEED INC. v. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01513
Date Filed2020-06-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffBUZZFEED INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed, Inc. submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning the use and abuse of gabapentinoids. BuzzFeed also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told BuzzFeed that its request would be put on the complex track for processing. BuzzFeed filed an administrative appeal of the agency's denial of expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, BuzzFeed filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-101COMPLAINT against FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7215024) filed by BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/10/2020)
2020-06-102NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/10/2020)
2020-06-103LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/10/2020)
2020-06-10Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, ) (Entered: 06/10/2020)
2020-06-104SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 06/10/2020)
2020-07-225ANSWER to Complaint by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
2020-07-22MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule by August 6, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/22/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
2020-07-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 8/6/2020. (tj) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-246Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2020)
2020-07-24MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Defendants' Consent Motion to Stay: It is hereby ORDERED that the proceedings in this case are stayed until October 26, 2020. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the current deadline for the parties to submit a joint proposed briefing schedule is VACATED and that the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before October 26, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/24/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 07/24/2020)
2020-07-277RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 6/22/2020 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/27/2020)
2020-07-278RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/22/2020. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/27/2020)
2020-07-279RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/22/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/22/2020. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/27/2020)
2020-07-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/26/2020. (tj) (Entered: 07/28/2020)
2020-07-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/26/2020. (tj) (Entered: 07/29/2020)
2020-10-2610Joint STATUS REPORT by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-10-26MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before November 24, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/26/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-10-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/24/2020 (ztj) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-11-2411Joint STATUS REPORT by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-24MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before January 5, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/24/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/5/2021 (tj) (Entered: 11/25/2020)
2021-01-0512Joint STATUS REPORT by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 01/05/2021)
2021-01-05MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 12 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before February 19, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/5/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/05/2021)
2021-01-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/19/2021 (tj) (Entered: 01/05/2021)
2021-02-1913Joint STATUS REPORT by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 02/19/2021)
2021-02-19MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 13 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before March 22, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/19/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/19/2021)
2021-03-2214Joint STATUS REPORT by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before April 21, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/22/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/21/2021. (tj) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-04-2115Joint STATUS REPORT by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2021)
2021-04-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 15 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before June 7, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/21/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/21/2021)
2021-04-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/7/2021 (tj) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
2021-06-0716Joint STATUS REPORT by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2021)
2021-06-09MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 16 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before July 7, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/9/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/09/2021)
2021-07-0717Joint STATUS REPORT by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 07/07/2021)
2021-07-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 17 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before August 6, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/7/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 07/07/2021)
2021-08-0618Joint STATUS REPORT by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 08/06/2021)
2021-08-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 18 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before September 7, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/6/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 08/06/2021)
2021-08-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/7/2021 (tj) (Entered: 08/13/2021)
2021-09-0719Joint STATUS REPORT by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 09/07/2021)
2021-09-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 19 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before October 7, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/7/2021. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/07/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar