Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTAHIRIH JUSTICE CENTER v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01516
Date Filed2020-06-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffTAHIRIH JUSTICE CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Tahirih Justice Center submitted a FOIA request to the Executive Office for Immigration Review for records in electronic format concerning its report titled Legal Orientation Program: Cohort Analysis. Tahirih Justice Center also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency asked the Tahirih Justice Center to clarify its request. It did so. The agency then told the Tahirih Justice Center that its request was being delayed for technical reasons. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Tahirih Justice Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-101COMPLAINT against All Defendants U.S. Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7215228) filed by TAHIRIH JUSTICE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Summons DOJ Summons, # 6 Summons EOIR Summons, # 7 Summons Barr Summons, # 8 Summons USAO Summons)(London, Ronald) (Entered: 06/10/2020)
2020-06-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TAHIRIH JUSTICE CENTER (London, Ronald) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-11Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-113SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-174RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/12/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/12/2020. (London, Ronald) (Entered: 06/17/2020)
2020-06-225RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/22/2020. (Attachments: # 1 USPS Confirmation)(London, Ronald) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-226RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW served on 6/18/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW served on 6/18/2020 (Attachments: # 1 USPS Confirmation)(London, Ronald) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-227RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/22/2020 (Attachments: # 1 USPS Confirmation)(London, Ronald) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar