Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCLEMENTE v. FBI, D.C. et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01527
Date Filed2020-06-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Thomas F. Hogan
PlaintiffANGELA CLEMENTE
Case DescriptionAngela Clemente submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning informant files of the agency's investigation of Gregory Scarpa, a mobster whose criminal activity had allegedly been protected by the FBI because of his role as an informant. Clemente also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but continued to claim that the files were protected under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Clemente filed an administrative appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Clemente filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantJOHN DOE AGENCY 1 THROUGH JOHN DOE AGENCY 10
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-101COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Plaintiffs (Against All Defendants) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7216377) filed by ANGELA CLEMENTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Notice to Counsel/Party, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/10/2020)
2020-06-102NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ANGELA CLEMENTE. Case related to Case No. 13-cv-108. (zmc) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-12Case assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (zmc) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-12SUMMONS Not Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (zmc) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-06-303REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE FBI filed by ANGELA CLEMENTE.(Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-06-304REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Department of Justice filed by ANGELA CLEMENTE.(Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-06-305REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE FBI filed by ANGELA CLEMENTE.(Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-06-306REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE John Doe Agency #1 through John Doe Agency #10 filed by ANGELA CLEMENTE.(Lesar, James) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar