Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBraggs v. Flagship Credit Acceptance
DistrictNorthern District of Texas
CityDallas
Case Number3:2020cv01520
Date Filed2020-06-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeSenior Judge A. Joe Fish
PlaintiffMyra Braggs
Case DescriptionMyra Bragg filed suit against Flagship Credit Acceptance, alleging securities fraud. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantFlagship Credit Acceptance
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-101New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the national and circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-102Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (jmg) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-103COMPLAINT against Flagship Credit Acceptance filed by Myra Braggs. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (jmg) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-104MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Myra Braggs. (jmg) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-105CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Myra Braggs. (jmg) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-11***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Thu Jun 11 13:39:24 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-156ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of the Court SHALL NOT ISSUE SUMMONS or take any further action pending judicial screening. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 6/15/2020) (axm) (Entered: 06/15/2020)
2020-06-15***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Mon Jun 15 12:48:26 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 06/15/2020)
2020-06-157Judge's Questionnaire sent to Myra Braggs. Deadline to respond to the questionnaire is 30 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 6/15/2020) (ykp) (Entered: 06/15/2020)
2020-06-15***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Mon Jun 15 16:31:39 CDT 2020 (crt) (Entered: 06/15/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar